NY S02822 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to responsible parties for petroleum contaminated sites and incentives to parties who are willing to remediate such sites; provides that a discharger may present evidence as to third party responsibility for petroleum discharge; provides for apportionment of liability; provides that parties willing to remediate such discharge shall be entitled to liability limitation.
Title
Relates to responsible parties for petroleum contaminated sites and incentives to parties who are willing to remediate such sites; provides that a discharger may present evidence as to third party responsibility for petroleum discharge; provides for apportionment of liability; provides that parties willing to remediate such discharge shall be entitled to liability limitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1257 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.861 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |