NY S02819 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-26 - CHAPTER 515
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on October 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-26 - CHAPTER 515
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of whipped cream chargers to persons under the age of twenty-one.
Title
Prohibits the sale of whipped cream chargers to persons under the age of twenty-one.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | Senate | CHAPTER 515 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.522 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a754a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2819A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.772 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00754 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s2819a