NY S02812 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the number of traffic-control signal photo violation-monitoring devices that may be installed in New York city to six hundred intersections; extends certain provisions authorizing photo-monitoring devices until December 1, 2027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the number of traffic-control signal photo violation-monitoring devices that may be installed in New York city to six hundred intersections; extends certain provisions authorizing photo-monitoring devices until December 1, 2027.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-07Assemblyhome rule request
2024-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.597
2024-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a5259a
2024-06-07Assemblyreferred to transportation
2024-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-06SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2024-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1827
2024-06-06SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 2812A
2024-05-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2023-01-24SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A05259 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s2812a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback