NY S02800 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mandatory training curriculum for election commissioners and key staff of boards of elections and to model poll worker training programs; requires the state board of elections to develop and provide to each county materials for a model poll worker training program which the counties may use to train individuals to serve as poll workers in state and county elections.
Title
Relates to mandatory training curriculum for election commissioners and key staff of boards of elections and to model poll worker training programs; requires the state board of elections to develop and provide to each county materials for a model poll worker training program which the counties may use to train individuals to serve as poll workers in state and county elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.102 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05142 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to election law