NY S02794 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the suspension of hunting and fishing licenses pursuant to the interstate wildlife violator compact.
Title
Relates to the suspension of hunting and fishing licenses pursuant to the interstate wildlife violator compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.395 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04002 (Same As) 2014-04-28 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION