NY S02791 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-16 - PRINT NUMBER 2791A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-16 - PRINT NUMBER 2791A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive membership with Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Ronald Bower, provided he files an application with the head of the NYSLRS within one year.
Title
Grants retroactive membership with Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Ronald Bower, provided he files an application with the head of the NYSLRS within one year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2791A |
2024-01-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05273 (Same As) 2024-01-31 - enacting clause stricken