NY S02786 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement of publishing a candidate's residence prior to an election.
Title
Removes the requirement of publishing a candidate's residence prior to an election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.310 |
2017-09-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.345 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5588 |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.316 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05588 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s2786