NY S02767 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.272
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.272
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the expansion of the production of fresh fruits and vegetables by community gardens.
Title
Encourages the expansion of the production of fresh fruits and vegetables by community gardens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.272 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.428 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2767A |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.524 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-30 | Senate | print number 6019a |
2019-04-30 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to agriculture |
2019-02-26 | Senate | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6019A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2767A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.428 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A06019 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.272