NY S02755 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - APPROVAL MEMO.51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - APPROVAL MEMO.51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the child poverty reduction advisory council to effectuate a fifty percent reduction of child poverty in the state within ten years.
Title
Establishes the child poverty reduction advisory council to effectuate a fifty percent reduction of child poverty in the state within ten years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-01 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.51 |
2021-12-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.646 |
2021-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.528 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a1160c |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2755C |
2021-05-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2755B |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1191 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2755A |
2021-02-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01160 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s2755c