NY S02746 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - PRINT NUMBER 2746A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - PRINT NUMBER 2746A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to study and make recommendations on school safety in the state of New York.
Title
Establishes a task force to study and make recommendations on school safety in the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2746A |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.341 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01815 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education