NY S02739 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8275A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8275A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the distribution of information in the pre-licensing course to operate a motor vehicle on how to register as an organ and tissue donor.
Title
Requires the distribution of information in the pre-licensing course to operate a motor vehicle on how to register as an organ and tissue donor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8275A |
2024-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.793 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2739A |
2024-04-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08275 (Same As) 2024-11-22 - signed chap.477