NY S02738 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 2738A
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 2738A
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to hearings regarding biennial maximum base rent adjustments.
Title
Relates to hearings regarding biennial maximum base rent adjustments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2738A |
2022-05-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00655 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT