NY S02735 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the following participating agencies for purposes of agency assisted voter registration: public libraries, local housing authorities, and public high schools; directs the state board of elections to promulgate rules and regulations for implementation.
Title
Makes the following participating agencies for purposes of agency assisted voter registration: public libraries, local housing authorities, and public high schools; directs the state board of elections to promulgate rules and regulations for implementation.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08571 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
A10841 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - referred to election law
A10841 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - referred to election law