NY S02733 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - SIGNED CHAP.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - SIGNED CHAP.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the number of signatures for designating petitions; provides dates for the signing and filing of designating petitions in 2021.
Title
Reduces the number of signatures for designating petitions; provides dates for the signing and filing of designating petitions in 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.22 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.15 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | substituted for a3356 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-01-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.143 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03356 (Same As) 2021-01-26 - substituted by s2733