NY S02728 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the law to include the preservation of regionally significant projects with respect to agencies drawing on funds for new building projects.
Title
Expands the law to include the preservation of regionally significant projects with respect to agencies drawing on funds for new building projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2022-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.642 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1326 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07253 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to local governments