NY S02725 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of non-consensual dissemination of sexually explicit images as a class A misdemeanor.
Title
Establishes the crime of non-consensual dissemination of sexually explicit images as a class A misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.79 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1028 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2725A |
2017-03-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01641 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes