NY S02723 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to aggravated cruelty to animals.
Title
Relates to aggravated cruelty to animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.608 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.197 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A00757 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture