NY S02722 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary New York craft beverage permit for all New York state manufactured liquor, spirits, wine, beer, cider and mead for events located in a municipality with a population of less than one million.
Title
Establishes a temporary New York craft beverage permit for all New York state manufactured liquor, spirits, wine, beer, cider and mead for events located in a municipality with a population of less than one million.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2024-04-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-04-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.758 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-02-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.278 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09072 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - referred to economic development