NY S02722 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the tenure of the temporary president of the senate, speaker of the assembly, majority leader of the senate, minority leader of the senate, majority leader of the assembly and minority leader of the assembly to 8 years; limits the tenure of the chairman of any single legislative committee to 8 consecutive years.
Title
Limits the tenure of the temporary president of the senate, speaker of the assembly, majority leader of the senate, minority leader of the senate, majority leader of the assembly and minority leader of the assembly to 8 years; limits the tenure of the chairman of any single legislative committee to 8 consecutive years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-24 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2016-02-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2722D |
2016-02-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2722C |
2016-02-01 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-01 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-01-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.6 |
2016-01-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-02-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2722B |
2015-02-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.73 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2722A |
2015-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04677 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - print number 4677d