NY S02718 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.266
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.266
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an authorized physician to direct that physical therapy care may be rendered by a certified physical therapist assistant.
Title
Permits an authorized physician to direct that physical therapy care may be rendered by a certified physical therapist assistant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.266 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.577 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a2116a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1674 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2718A |
2016-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1268 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A02116 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s2718a