NY S02713 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the erection or maintenance of billboards advertising alcoholic beverages within 1000 feet of schools and playgrounds; defines billboards.
Title
Prohibits the erection or maintenance of billboards advertising alcoholic beverages within 1000 feet of schools and playgrounds; defines billboards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.996 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06978 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to consumer affairs and protection