NY S02712 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-17 - SIGNED CHAP.532
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Pays drug-impaired driving surcharges to counties for programs and initiatives to reduce drug-impaired driving incidences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pays drug-impaired driving surcharges to counties for programs and initiatives to reduce drug-impaired driving incidences.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-17SenateSIGNED CHAP.532
2023-10-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.626
2023-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a4755b
2023-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1633
2023-06-06SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 2712B
2023-05-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2023-05-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 2712A
2023-05-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2023-02-01SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-01-24SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A04755 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - substituted by s2712b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2712
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02712&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02712
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02712&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02712A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02712&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02712B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2712#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2712#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02712&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2712#SC2

Bill Comments

feedback