NY S02708 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the installation of climb deterrent fencing on all bridges under the jurisdiction of the New York State Bridge Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the installation of climb deterrent fencing on all bridges under the jurisdiction of the New York State Bridge Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-04Assemblyreferred to transportation
2024-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-04SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1685
2024-06-04SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 2708A
2024-05-29SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2023-01-24SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A09248 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - print number 9248a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback