NY S02708 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a tree removal and emerald ash elimination credit.
Title
Relates to establishing a tree removal and emerald ash elimination credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1485 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2708A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A05788 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means