NY S02682 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals certain provisions relating to the assessment and reimbursement of state expenditures and requires reimbursement of monies previously paid.
Title
Repeals certain provisions relating to the assessment and reimbursement of state expenditures and requires reimbursement of monies previously paid.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] | Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Sen. Stephen Saland [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-03-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.148 |
2011-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01358 (Same As) 2012-03-13 - enacting clause stricken