NY S02681 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary task force on the variable supplements fund program to make findings and recommendations.
Title
Establishes a temporary task force on the variable supplements fund program to make findings and recommendations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.305 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03716 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in governmental employees