NY S02679 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes volunteer firefighters from other states to offer and provide their services to fire departments, districts and companies in this state.
Title
Authorizes volunteer firefighters from other states to offer and provide their services to fire departments, districts and companies in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.881 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.753 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2679A |
2013-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04437 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
A09388 (Same As) 2014-04-24 - referred to local governments
A09388 (Same As) 2014-04-24 - referred to local governments