NY S02666 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the division of homeland security and emergency services and others to conduct a review of security of metropolitan transportation authority facilities.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the division of homeland security and emergency services and others to conduct a review of security of metropolitan transportation authority facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2017-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2666A |
2017-06-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |