NY S02657 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances the penalty for persons who violate orders of protection after having been previously convicted of violating such orders.
Title
Enhances the penalty for persons who violate orders of protection after having been previously convicted of violating such orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.624 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.165 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04621 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in codes