NY S02645 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires regulations authorizing computer science courses to count towards liberal arts content at institutions of higher learning; defines computer science.
Title
Requires regulations authorizing computer science courses to count towards liberal arts content at institutions of higher learning; defines computer science.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2016-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.921 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-05-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.238 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00529 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to higher education