NY S02632 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the inclusion of a confession of judgment in a contract or agreement for a financial product or service.
Title
Prohibits the inclusion of a confession of judgment in a contract or agreement for a financial product or service.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1020 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02443 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to banks