NY S02628 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of automated purchasing software to buy large quantities of goods for the purpose of retail resale of such goods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of automated purchasing software to buy large quantities of goods for the purpose of retail resale of such goods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.562
2019-01-28SenateREFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY

Same As/Similar To

A06641 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - referred to consumer affairs and protection

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback