NY S02625 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 2625A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 2625A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the election of regents and the creation of the commission on regents.
Title
Relates to the election of regents and the creation of the commission on regents.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2625A |
2018-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1430 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |