NY S02620 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a direct service professional credit and career ladder tuition assistance grant program to develop training programs and improve existing workforce development programs for the purpose of training direct support professionals and establishing a career ladder for individuals working with individuals with developmental disabilities.
Title
Establishes a direct service professional credit and career ladder tuition assistance grant program to develop training programs and improve existing workforce development programs for the purpose of training direct support professionals and establishing a career ladder for individuals working with individuals with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1422 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2021-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05260 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education