NY S02618 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-20)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a state transportation plan; requires the commissioner of transportation to submit to the governor and the legislature long-range transportation plans and five-year capital plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a state transportation plan; requires the commissioner of transportation to submit to the governor and the legislature long-range transportation plans and five-year capital plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1096
2018-01-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 2618A
2018-01-26SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to transportation
2017-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.886
2017-01-13SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A01234 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 1234b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback