NY S02606 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes housing authorities to operate bingo games; adds guests invited by residents of any apartment, condominium or cooperative complex, housing authority, retirement community, or other group residential complex or facility to the scope of application; allows games to be conducted two days per week; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes housing authorities to operate bingo games; adds guests invited by residents of any apartment, condominium or cooperative complex, housing authority, retirement community, or other group residential complex or facility to the scope of application; allows games to be conducted two days per week; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.313 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.436 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A08216 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to racing and wagering