NY S02606 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5784B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5784B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the construction of any mausoleum or columbarium in a cemetery where such mausoleum or columbarium is the only form of interment offered in a cemetery, except in limited circumstances to assure the perpetual care of remains already in a mausoleum or columbarium.
Title
Prohibits the construction of any mausoleum or columbarium in a cemetery where such mausoleum or columbarium is the only form of interment offered in a cemetery, except in limited circumstances to assure the perpetual care of remains already in a mausoleum or columbarium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5784B |
2018-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2606B |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1239 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-02-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2606A |
2017-02-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05784 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.296