NY S02605 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to harassment of a rent regulated tenant; establishes the crimes of harassment of a rent regulated tenant in the first and second degree.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to harassment of a rent regulated tenant; establishes the crimes of harassment of a rent regulated tenant in the first and second degree.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A6188
2019-03-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.214
2019-01-28SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A06188 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback