NY S02597 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions for internal audits by school districts from annually to every five years.
Title
Extends provisions for internal audits by school districts from annually to every five years.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2010 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04467 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to education