NY S02595 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - PRINT NUMBER 2595B
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - PRINT NUMBER 2595B
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to gender balance on boards of state and local public authorities.
Title
Relates to gender balance on boards of state and local public authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2595B |
2020-08-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2595A |
2019-05-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00587 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES