NY S02591 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the enforcement of provisions relating to carriers of household goods by motor vehicle; authorizes the attorney general to seek an injunction to enjoin and restrain the continuance or threat of certain violations by such carriers.
Title
Relates to the enforcement of provisions relating to carriers of household goods by motor vehicle; authorizes the attorney general to seek an injunction to enjoin and restrain the continuance or threat of certain violations by such carriers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2591A |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.823 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.81 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02015 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES