NY S02589 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires telephone companies to disclose information to subscribers regarding the backup power solution for their voice service equipment.
Title
Requires telephone companies to disclose information to subscribers regarding the backup power solution for their voice service equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2023-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2589A |
2023-03-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2023-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04587 (Same As) 2024-03-27 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS