NY S02573 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the admissibility of testimony that a person reported acts of discrimination to another person in a civil trial under the human rights law, including the contents of such report.
Title
Permits the admissibility of testimony that a person reported acts of discrimination to another person in a civil trial under the human rights law, including the contents of such report.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2024-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.612 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2573A |
2024-01-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-04-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.575 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01697 (Same As) 2024-01-05 - print number 1697a