NY S02556 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a process for notification of new homeless shelters and conducting a public information session in the community where the proposed shelter is to be located.
Title
Requires a process for notification of new homeless shelters and conducting a public information session in the community where the proposed shelter is to be located.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.68 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.86 |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | substituted for a3022 |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2021-02-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.140 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03022 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - substituted by s2556