NY S02550 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE
Pending: Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE
Pending: Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits lobbyists who are convicted of or plead guilty to class D felonies or higher level crimes from acting as a lobbyist for a period of three years from the date of the conviction; provides the authority to extend suspensions; entitles such lobbyist to a hearing upon application for suspension extension.
Title
Prohibits lobbyists who are convicted of or plead guilty to class D felonies or higher level crimes from acting as a lobbyist for a period of three years from the date of the conviction; provides the authority to extend suspensions; entitles such lobbyist to a hearing upon application for suspension extension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2021-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06029 (Same As) 2021-09-15 - enacting clause stricken