NY S02546 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of health to make additional payments for inpatient services provided to recipients of medical assistance by certain public hospitals.
Title
Directs the department of health to make additional payments for inpatient services provided to recipients of medical assistance by certain public hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2008 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03126 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to health