NY S02543 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for insurance reimbursement for expenses related to the provision of personal protective equipment (PPE) for direct care workers, care recipients and an emergency inventory of a ninety-day supply of PPE.
Title
Provides for insurance reimbursement for expenses related to the provision of personal protective equipment (PPE) for direct care workers, care recipients and an emergency inventory of a ninety-day supply of PPE.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00179 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means