NY S02539 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for distinctive license plates for gold star family members; eliminates the registration fee for gold star mother and gold star family member distinctive license plates.
Title
Provides for distinctive license plates for gold star family members; eliminates the registration fee for gold star mother and gold star family member distinctive license plates.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] |
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.208 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1263 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01696 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation