NY S02538 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to distinctive license plates issued to gold star mothers; permits gold star mothers to retain one keepsake plate as a commemorative item after distinctive plates are surrendered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to distinctive license plates issued to gold star mothers; permits gold star mothers to retain one keepsake plate as a commemorative item after distinctive plates are surrendered.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14Assemblyreferred to transportation
2018-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1784
2018-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-05-24Assemblyreferred to transportation
2017-05-24AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-24SenateREPASSED SENATE
2017-05-02SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2538A
2017-05-02SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-02Senatereturned to senate
2017-05-02AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2017-03-02Assemblyreferred to transportation
2017-03-02SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-03-02SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-03-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-02-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.220
2017-01-13SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A05573 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback