NY S02536 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes additional fines when a person fails to appear before the court, pay fines or complete counseling and/or community service as mandated under a conviction of unlawful possession of an alcoholic beverage with intent to consume by persons under the age of twenty-one.
Title
Imposes additional fines when a person fails to appear before the court, pay fines or complete counseling and/or community service as mandated under a conviction of unlawful possession of an alcoholic beverage with intent to consume by persons under the age of twenty-one.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1070 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.90 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A04495 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to economic development